THE CHARITIES OF JUDITH AND MARY ALSAGER

Charity number: 216317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £130 £107 £114 £115 £117
Total expenditure £120 £120 £120 £120 £120
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A