Trustees THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN

Charity number: 216401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Anthony Berkett Chair 04 October 2018
CHILDLINE
Received: On time
Emma Jane Smyth Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
Albert Lawrence Heaney Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Eithne Mary Fiona Daly Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Ife Grillo Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Sheanna Patelmaster Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Thomas Christoforos Toumazis MBE Trustee 04 October 2018
London Freemasons Charity
Received: On time
Sarah Louise Ridgway Trustee 04 October 2018
None on record
Derrick Edward Mortimer Trustee 04 October 2018
None on record
ANDREW CAMERON KERR Trustee 04 October 2018
None on record
Philippa Jane Gough Trustee 04 October 2018
None on record
Clement Irwin Brohier Trustee 06 October 2016
G B CAIRD MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF MANSFIELD COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
PROF TANYA BYRON Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
JOHN ALEXANDER WORTH Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
Andrew David Briggs Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
Dr JOANNA BEGENT Trustee 19 March 2015
None on record
Tarek Khlat Trustee 04 December 2014
None on record
JAMES CHRISTIAN PATRICK BAILEY Trustee 01 May 2013
GEORGE CLARKE
Received: On time