Financial history THE MUNTZ TRUST

Charity number: 216934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.55k £3.15k £4.36k £4.63k £4.72k
Total expenditure £2.50k £3.00k £4.00k £5.50k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A