Trustees REVEREND JOHN ASHTON'S CHARITY (ESTATE TRUSTEES)

Charity number: 216941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael David Birch Trustee 02 March 2022
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
Peter Hallam Trustee 05 January 2022
FOXT VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
Thomas Michael Irwin Trustee 29 July 2020
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
Leslie John Jackson Trustee 26 June 2019
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
Brian Snow Trustee 07 May 2019
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
IPSTONES WAR MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Heather James Trustee 07 May 2015
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
IPSTONES PARISH COUNCIL Trustee
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
JANET MAY CHADWICK Trustee
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
LINDA ANN MALYON Trustee
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
PATRICK STIMPSON Trustee
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time
ANDREW WEST STEVENSON Trustee
WILLIAM ADAMS
Received: On time