Accounts and annual returns HIRWAUN BRANCH OAP ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 217000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required