THE CARADOC AND SEVERN VALLEY FIELD CLUB

Charity number: 217062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.79k £4.04k £4.76k £4.99k £2.40k
Total expenditure £4.76k £3.97k £3.87k £4.72k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A