Putney United Gospel Society

Charity number: 217067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.33k £14.17k £15.04k £15.74k £12.52k
Total expenditure £15.90k £9.05k £10.25k £25.53k £6.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A