Financial history THE SUTTON CHARITY ICW THE LEICESTER ROYAL INFIRMARY

Charity number: 217599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.00k £4.20k £4.26k £4.32k £4.46k
Total expenditure £1.50k £2.25k £2.40k £3.60k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A