ST JOHN COLE

Charity number: 217974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £5.19k £5.46k £5.54k £5.67k £5.77k
Total expenditure £6.06k £5.31k £4.97k £4.81k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A