Financial history SHREWSBURY SECULAR CLERGY FUND

Charity number: 218087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £42.39k £48.44k £48.12k £48.29k £28.12k
Total expenditure £37.89k £38.59k £45.62k £53.75k £59.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A