Trustees RHOSHIRWAUN VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 218296
Charity reporting is overdue by 255 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE MARY ROBERTS | Chair | 03 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
MARY ANITRA WATSON | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
RHIAN ROBERTS | Trustee | 06 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
IDRIS JONES | Trustee | 06 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ROBERTS | Trustee | 06 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
IOLA PHILLIPS EVANS | Trustee | 06 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
BERYL JONES | Trustee | 06 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE EVANS | Trustee | 06 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
MRS ELLEN HUGHES | Trustee | 06 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GLYN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
GARETH JONES | Trustee | 05 July 1988 |
|
|
||||
HUW JONES | Trustee | 05 July 1988 |
|
|
||||
BERYL WYN JONES | Trustee | 14 April 1980 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.