Financial history CHARITY OF HENRY FORSTER

Charity number: 218930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021
Total gross income £3.43k £8.36k £8.53k £8.70k £8.91k
Total expenditure £3.43k £8.77k £8.67k £8.88k £8.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A