Trustees VILLAGE HALL (STRETTON ON DUNSMORE)
Charity number: 219263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE HAYWOOD | Chair | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Katie Waterworth | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Haywood | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Paul Stewart | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Bannister | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Austin Timings | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ella Kennedy | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA JEANETTE SPARROW | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL KENNETH COOPER | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.