THE ST CLEARS TOWN TRUST

Charity number: 219727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £600 £500 £881 £1.00k £650
Total expenditure £1.31k £1.31k £3.42k £1.20k £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A