Financial history FRIENDS OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 220106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.98k £7.14k £7.14k £982 £783
Total expenditure £3.17k £6.14k £995 £5.42k £5.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A