PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 220316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required