Trustees CATBROOK AND DISTRICT MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 220456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON JAMES WESTWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philip Robinson | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Marie Hext | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Dawn Clare Lawton | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Pullan | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
richard cobourne | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NORMAN GOODING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.