CONVENT OF THE SACRED HEART OF JESUS

Charity number: 220594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £146.32k £148.07k £137.98k £170.48k £149.52k
Total expenditure £137.08k £167.27k £184.36k £181.19k £190.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A