THE HOUSE OF ST GREGORY AND ST MACRINA (OXFORD) LIMITED

Charity number: 220842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Nevsky James Everett Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Professor Sir Malcolm David Evans KCMG OBE Trustee 26 October 2021
REGENT'S PARK COLLEGE Received: On time
VERY REVD DR IAN PAUL EDWARD GRAHAM Trustee 18 November 2021
THE FELLOWSHIP OF ST ALBAN AND ST SERGIUS Received: On time
THE OXFORD ORTHODOX CHURCH BUILDING TRUST Received: On time
KEVIN MAURICE SERAPHIM ALTON HONEYWELL Chair 15 November 2018
THE METROPOLITAN ANTHONY OF SOUROZH FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE ORTHODOX EUCHARISTIC COMMUNITY IN SOUTH LONDON Received: On time
His Eminence Metropolitan Kallistos of Diokelia Trustee 19 November 2015
ORTHODOX PARISH OF ST JOHN OF KRONSTADT Received: On time
THE SAINT THEOSEVIA TRUST Received: On time
THE ORTHODOX ASSOCIATION OF THEOLOGICAL SCHOOLS (OATS) Overdue by 31 days
THE FELLOWSHIP OF ST ALBAN AND ST SERGIUS Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
FRIENDS OF MOUNT ATHOS Received: On time
THE OXFORD ORTHODOX CHURCH BUILDING TRUST Received: On time
THE CONVENT OF ST JOHN OF KRONSTADT Received: On time
THE INSTITUTE FOR ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN STUDIES Received: On time
THE ECUMENICAL MARIAN PILGRIMAGE TRUST Received: On time
THE SAINT ELIAS MONASTERY TRUST Received: On time
Professor ALEXANDER LINGAS Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
Professor Pieter Willem Francois Trustee 18 November 2021 None on record
TORSTEN ST JOHN WHITE Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Anthony Patrick O'Mahony Trustee 15 November 2018 None on record
VERY REVD STEPHEN TOBIAS PLATT Trustee 18 November 2021 None on record
Joshua Christian Townson Trustee 15 June 2021 None on record