Accounts and annual returns THE BOROUGH LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 221001
Charity reporting is overdue by 992 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 262 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 262 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 627 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 627 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 992 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 992 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 19 February 2021 | 477 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window