CHARITIES OF MISS HANNAH LEE

Charity number: 221052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 02 April 1964: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 August 2011: Re-registered
  • 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 06 August 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property