Accounts and annual returns BILLINGHAM UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 221106
Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 327 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 327 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 692 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 692 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 February 2019 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required