Trustees GRAMER COTTAGES

Charity number: 221519
Charity reporting is overdue by 174 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY EVANS Chair
None on record
Alison Wortley Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Jane Bamford Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Professor Michael Enscot Trustee 07 March 2023
ATHERSTONE CHORAL SOCIETY CIO
Received: On time
Terry Hardy Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
David Harvey Trustee 14 July 2017
MANCETTER MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
BRENDA EVANS Trustee 01 December 2015
None on record
JAYNE SAUNDERS Trustee 01 September 2011
None on record