Trustees THE ROYAL NUMISMATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 221850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARTIN ROBERT ALLEN | Chair | 11 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Edmund Cribb | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shreya Gupta | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Anne Jane Moore | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Megan Laura Gooch | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Courtney Reiko Nimura | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marguerite Spoerri Butcher | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Etsuko Zakoji | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shailendra Umakant Bhandare | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Ian Brown | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Johanne Elizabeth Porter | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Gordon d'Alton | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mafalda da Conceicao Rodrigues Farinha Raposo | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Hill | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Ball | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Scott Shepherd | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Clare Philippa Rowan | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Burnett CBE | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.