Trustees WELSH PONY AND COB SOCIETY
Charity number: 222014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaretta Ann Bigley Mrs | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Hook | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn John Davies | Trustee | 08 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ventia Parry | Trustee | 08 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edwin George Prosser | Trustee | 08 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Paul James Gummery | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Cemaes Evans | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Waters | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Kember | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dilwyn Owain Roberts | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.