The Stanley Common Eventide Community Hall

Charity number: 222220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.69k £34.86k £22.95k £24.89k £24.89k
Total expenditure £20.39k £31.03k £32.06k £23.41k £23.41k
Income from government contracts £10.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £20.00k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k