MORPETH DISPENSARY

Charity number: 222352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.09k £3.54k £3.96k £3.31k £3.30k
Total expenditure £3.73k £2.61k £3.75k £1.91k £2.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A