THE MAGIC CIRCLE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 222408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.03k £5.00k £3.11k £3.27k £4.64k
Total expenditure £4.70k £7.59k £9.99k £14.88k £13.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A