Trustees THE BOOTH MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 223009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET TICKNER Chair 12 June 2012
None on record
Dr John Key Trustee 15 February 2017
None on record
Rev LINDSAY SOUTHERN Trustee 30 October 2013
FRIENDS OF ST ANNES CHURCH CATTERICK VILLAGE
Overdue by 301 days
REVEREND MICHAEL SYDDALL'S CHARITY
Overdue by 26 days
MARGARET EARLE FOR THE POOR
Overdue by 26 days
Kath Swainston Trustee 30 October 2013
None on record
SHEILA PROOM Trustee 12 June 2012
None on record
Ros Sweeny Trustee 01 January 2010
None on record
Heather Walker Trustee 01 January 2000
None on record