STEPHEN R AND PHILIPPA H SOUTHALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 223190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £145.52k £72.70k £110.73k £109.47k £110.54k
Total expenditure £66.50k £105.17k £150.79k £111.80k £108.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A