AGE UK BOLTON

Charity number: 223240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £462.03k £480.02k £560.00k £757.11k £743.52k
Total expenditure £429.06k £475.15k £589.90k £757.71k £766.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £324.52k
Income from government grants £210.33k £91.00k £339.87k £606.62k £324.52k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £10.23k £10.97k £5.19k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £80.56k £1.07k £32.45k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £388.62k £624.69k £630.98k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £69.62k £81.22k £74.90k
Income - Other N/A N/A £10.97k £39.16k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £511.66k £757.71k £766.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £78.24k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £8.83k £7.00k £7.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0