ARNOLD DISTRICT OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 223260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £10.82k £11.46k £11.79k £13.34k £22.24k
Total expenditure £13.47k £11.50k £7.62k £11.37k £14.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k