THE WILLIAMSON HOME FUND

Charity number: 223347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.52k £7.31k £7.89k £8.06k £8.30k
Total expenditure £9.69k £6.27k £9.47k £8.24k £7.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A