RHONDDA WARD OLD AGE WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 223784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.15k £9.95k £3.63k £4.54k £13.57k
Total expenditure £2.67k £2.70k £2.66k £3.95k £13.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £300