Trustees DACRE INSTITUTE
Charity number: 224599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WILLIAM MALLINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Philip Donoghue | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade O'Halloran | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Joyce Coleman | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Coutts | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Welsh | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE MALLINSON | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MORNA FRANCES SIMS | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|||||
ROBERT MICHAEL WALTON | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER JOHN PRESCOTT FCA | Trustee | 14 April 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.