Trustees CHARITIES OF THOMAS WADE AND OTHERS
Charity number: 224939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MARK PULLAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Cllr Patricia Margaret Smith | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Hamilton | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Wayne Alan Dixon | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Smart | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Elisabeth Garthwaite | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Maybury | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|||||
PETER CYRIL ROBERT LEWIS | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Cllr Mohammed Rafique | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mr Tim Barber | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CHARLES WARD | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS DAVID MERCER | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM RICHARDSON | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Douglas Pike | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|||||
SUSAN REDDINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY JILL FINNIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN TINKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN STODDART-SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.