Financial history THE KING'S OWN MEMORIAL CHAPEL FUND

Charity number: 225269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £7.02k £8.49k £7.06k £6.19k £7.55k
Total expenditure £1.13k £4.65k £28.32k £7.99k £6.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A