THE CLERGY COTTAGE TRUST

Charity number: 225273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.15k £7.34k £6.65k £7.66k £3.77k
Total expenditure £4.99k £10.15k £4.66k £5.88k £5.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A