Charity overview JOHN MERRYWETHER
Charity number: 204400-25
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 28 JULY 1955 AS VARIED BY ORDERS DATED 27 NOVEMBER 1956 AND 6 MARCH 1980
Charitable objects
1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY ONE EQUAL MOIETY OF THE CLEAR YEARLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE PAROCIAL CHARITIES IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BENSINGTON OR BENSON. 2) BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE OF THE ALMSHOUSES BELONGING TO THE CHARITIES WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) RESIDE IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WOKINGHAM AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WOKINGHAM AS DETAILED IN CLAUSE 61 OF SCHEME OF 28 JULY 1955.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WOKINGHAM
Registration history
- 23 February 1962: Standard registration
- 14 November 2008: Removed
- 14 November 2008: Funds transferred to 1107171 Wokingham United Charities
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.