Trustees RSPCA HALIFAX, HUDDERSFIELD, BRADFORD & DISTRICT BRANCH
Charity number: 225575

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Watkinson | Chair | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Williams | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Evans | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Brimble | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Fisher | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cordingley | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZ LINDSAY | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
CATHRYN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIEN ASPEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.