AINTREE LEAGUE OF HOSPITAL & COMMUNITY FRIENDS

Charity number: 225607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £8.44k £19.47k £18.93k £16.07k £15.34k
Total expenditure £5.17k £16.17k £16.73k £18.40k £12.66k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A