Financial history WALKER MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 225724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £3.56k £4.95k £12.05k £11.38k £4.00k
Total expenditure £3.74k £5.38k £3.33k £3.15k £9.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k £9.67k N/A