Financial history ABBEYFIELD LOUGHTON SOCIETY

Charity number: 227729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £185.67k £186.76k £173.60k £146.95k £114.71k
Total expenditure £143.20k £133.51k £137.86k £151.16k £146.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A