Accounts and annual returns CARTERTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE HALL

Charity number: 227773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required