Financial history LUDWORTH AND MELLOR WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 227951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £17.31k £17.25k £15.39k £15.63k £19.95k
Total expenditure £13.92k £15.58k £10.08k £11.51k £9.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k