Trustees ELIAS JOHN WILKINSON GIBB MEMORIAL
Charity number: 228040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Andrew Charles Spencer Peacock | Chair | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Pfeifer | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Charles Peter Melville | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Fozia Bora | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dominic Parvez Brookshaw | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Markiewicz | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew David Marsham | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor R GLEAVE | Trustee | 28 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CAROLE HILLENBRAND OBE FBA FR | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.