THE VIOLET MELCHETT CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 228197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.70k £3.81k £3.93k £4.97k £1.31k
Total expenditure £10.25k £11.50k £13.49k £17.29k £20.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A