Trustees WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - FRINTON-ON-SEA
Charity number: 228989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Ann Peters | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Margaret Hughes | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Svvennsen | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenene Marie Catherine Mackenzie | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Oakman | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Caroline Blythe | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vola Cecilia Carter | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Dennise Jenkins | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celia Phyllis de Laune | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Kettle | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rose Holyoak Mrs | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth O'Connor Ms | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Marie Rose Mrs | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Vivian Stansfield Mrs | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.