SOCIETY OF JESUS TRUST OF 1929 FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES

Charity number: 230165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £24.64m £66.06m £25.77m £30.77m £29.13m
Total expenditure £28.92m £46.98m £27.66m £48.89m £33.50m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.45m £4.27m £3.56m £5.64m £5.78m
Income - Other trading activities £227.00k £225.00k £131.00k £132.00k £114.00k
Income - Charitable activities £8.95m £9.33m £9.60m £10.39m £8.98m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.54m £11.80m £11.75m £14.23m £10.25m
Income - Other £464.00k £40.43m £720.00k £370.00k £4.01m
Income - Legacies £490.00k £850.00k £327.00k £546.00k £1.14m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £26.47m £44.15m £24.87m £46.14m £30.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.46m £2.83m £2.79m £2.75m £2.76m
Expenditure - Governance £64.00k £60.00k £70.37k £76.63k £64.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.68m £25.60m £5.57m £22.85m £7.61m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.40m £1.74m £1.76m £1.78m £1.91m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0