AGE CONCERN NEWARK

Charity number: 230361
Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jill Dickinson Trustee 28 April 2014 None on record
Benjamin William Brown Trustee 01 May 2015 None on record
DIANNE EVELYN MUNFORD Trustee 12 March 2006 None on record
ROBIN ANTHONY STEEDMAN Trustee 24 April 2012 None on record
MR PIP APPS Chair 12 March 2002 None on record